EP3754120 - REMOTE CONTROL SYSTEM AND MAIN CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Hitoshi c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
SAIKI, Seiji c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Kazuhiro c/o Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19777489.6 | 24.01.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019JP02333 | Priority number, date | JP20180062609 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018062609 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019187565 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754120 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754120 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, B60R1/00, E02F9/26, H04N7/18, E02F3/43 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
B60R1/27 (EP,US);
E02F3/435 (EP,US);
E02F9/20 (EP);
E02F9/2062 (EP);
E02F9/26 (EP);
E02F9/261 (EP,US);
E02F9/264 (EP,US);
G05D1/0016 (US);
G05D1/0038 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
H04N7/18 (EP);
H04N7/185 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | E02F9/20, B60R1/00, E02F9/26, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND HAUPTSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/52] | English: | REMOTE CONTROL SYSTEM AND MAIN CONTROL DEVICE | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE PRINCIPAL | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | Translation filed | 16.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | LU | 24.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0617444 (FUJITA CORP) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH10252101 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2012107395 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [AD] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2018051446 (YOSHINADA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013113044 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [A] 1-16* , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016160741 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-16 * , claims & US 2018/0051446 A1, claims & WO 2016/140055 A1 & DE 112016001043 T & AU 2016227095 A & CA 2976890 A1 & CN 107250466 A & KR 10-2017-0107076 A * | by applicant | JPH10252101 | JP2012107395 |