EP3779361 - VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/39] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWABATA, Akihiro c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
AKAHOSHI, Tsuyoshi c/o Hitachi Solutions, Ltd. 12-7, Higashishinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19777791.5 | 26.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP12694 | Priority number, date | JP20180067455 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018067455 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189083 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779361 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/30, G08G1/0969, G09B29/00, G09B29/10 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
G01C21/30 (EP);
G01C21/32 (US);
G01C21/3602 (US);
G01C21/3815 (US);
G01C21/3848 (US);
G01S19/485 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | Translation filed | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015362326 (FUJIMOTO KOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0038] , [0043] - [0046]; figure 7 *; | [Y] - TORRE FERNANDO TORRE@CS UMN EDU ET AL, "Matching GPS traces to (possibly) incomplete map data bridging map building and map matching", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES ON GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20121106), doi:10.1145/2424321.2424411, ISBN 978-1-4503-1691-0, pages 546 - 549, XP058467825 [Y] 1-12 * page 547, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2424321.2424411 | International search | [A]JP2008026032 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2008/0021638 A1, entire text, all drawings & DE 102007033461 A1 & CN 101109639 A *; | [A]JP2008134187 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-12* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013156034 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2013238544 | JP2014238297 |