EP3780227 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTIC SOLUTION AND ENERGY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND ENERGY DEVICE USING SAME | ||
[2024/14] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - German title | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - English title | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - French title | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | For all designated states MU Ionic Solutions Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Daisuke c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19778330.1 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP13279 | Priority number, date | JP20180060481 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018060481 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189413 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780227 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3780227 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42, H01G11/64, C07D327/04, // H01G11/06, H01G11/50, H01G11/60, H01M4/525, H01M4/587 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
C07D327/04 (EP,KR);
C07D411/12 (KR);
H01G11/06 (EP,KR);
H01G11/64 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M10/4235 (EP);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/48 (US);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01G11/50 (EP);
H01G11/60 (EP);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
H01M2300/0025 (EP);
H01M2300/0028 (US);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01M10/0567, C07D327/04, H01G11/06, H01G11/64, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTWÄSSRIGE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND ENERGIEVORRICHTUNG, DIE DIESE ENTHÄLT | [2024/30] | English: | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTIC SOLUTION AND ENERGY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2024/30] | French: | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON-AQUEUSE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉNERGIE LA CONTENANT | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/07] | WASSERFREIE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND ENERGIEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | ||
Former [2021/07] | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND ENERGY DEVICE USING SAME | ||
Former [2021/07] | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE ET DISPOSITIF À ÉNERGIE L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | Translation filed | 30.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006292452 (UTSUGI KOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015372349 (SHIKITA SHOJI [JP]); | [A]EP3086398 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]); | [A]EP3203569 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]WO2012147818 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]WO2014021272 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]WO2017043576 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]EP3182497 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO2009113545 | WO2011016440 | WO2011034067 | JP2011187235 | JP2014026972 | JP2018060481 |