EP3854011 - INTELLIGENT GROUPING OF NETWORK NODES FOR REMOTE INTERFERENCE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARAC, Filip Dalgångsslingan 28 141 92 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
FAXÉR, Sebastian Kungsholms strand 139 112 48 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
IRUKULAPATI, Naga Vishnu Kanth Rundradiogatan 4, Igh 1204 421 35 Västra Frölunda / SE | 04 /
SUNDBERG, Mårten Tämnarvägen 26A 120 53 Årsta / SE | 05 /
BJÖRKEGREN, Håkan Manganvägen 32 187 46 Täby / SE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19779178.3 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019IB57869 | Priority number, date | US201862734867P | 21.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862734867 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058878 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854011 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/20, H04J11/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04B17/20 (EP);
H04W36/20 (US);
H04B17/27 (US);
H04B17/345 (US);
H04J11/0056 (EP);
H04W36/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H04B17/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE GRUPPIERUNG VON NETZWERKKNOTEN ZUR FERNINTERFERENZVERWALTUNG | [2021/30] | English: | INTELLIGENT GROUPING OF NETWORK NODES FOR REMOTE INTERFERENCE MANAGEMENT | [2021/30] | French: | REGROUPEMENT INTELLIGENT DE NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU POUR UNE GESTION D'INTERFÉRENCE À DISTANCE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 20.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102595471 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [I]WO2013137796 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-20 * page 1, lines 9, 10; claim 1 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 32 - line 36 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 12 * * figures 1-15 * |