EP3857643 - ANTENNA WITH GRADIENT-INDEX METAMATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OU, Yu-Chin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
TASSOUDJI, Mohammad Ali 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19779656.8 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US51232 | Priority number, date | US201816145799 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US201816145799 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068464 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857643 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04, H01Q15/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0414 (EP);
H01Q15/0086 (EP,US);
H01Q21/065 (US);
H01Q5/357 (US);
H01Q9/0442 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | ANTENNE MIT GRADIENTENINDEX-METAMATERIAL | [2021/31] | English: | ANTENNA WITH GRADIENT-INDEX METAMATERIAL | [2021/31] | French: | ANTENNE AVEC MÉTAMATÉRIAU À GRADIENT D'INDICE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012299797 (MURDOCK JAMES N [US], et al); | [XAI]US2013027269 (ORIME NOBUTAKE [JP], et al); | [XAYI]KR20140014520 (XNIL CO LTD [KR]); | [XAI]US2014354513 (NAIR DEEPUKUMAR M [US], et al); | [XAYI]US2016028161 (KAWAGUCHI KAZUSHI [JP], et al); |