EP3853754 - SOFTWARE POLICY ENGINE IN VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Frederick K. 921 W. Graythorn Pl. Tucson, Arizona 85737 / US | 02 /
NISHAT, Uzma 14559 S Camino Larga Vista Sahuarita, Arizona 85629 / US | 03 /
MOYER, Geoffrey G. 4721 North Oeste Pl Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | 04 /
WATTERS, Stephen L. 3232 West Tumamoc Drive Tucson, Arizona 85745 / US | 05 /
VERNON, Jeffrey M. 383 N Nightfall Ave Tucson, Arizona 85748 / US | 06 /
DELY, Alex 8522 E Helen Pl Tucson, Arizona 85715 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19779662.6 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US51285 | Priority number, date | US201816132715 | 17.09.2018 Original published format: US201816132715 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020060920 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853754 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3853754 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/53, G06F9/455, G06F21/56 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/577 (US);
G06F21/552 (US);
G06F21/566 (EP);
G06F9/44521 (US);
H04L63/20 (US);
G06F2221/033 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | SOFTWARERICHTLINIENMASCHINE IN EINER VIRTUELLEN UMGEBUNG | [2021/30] | English: | SOFTWARE POLICY ENGINE IN VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT | [2021/30] | French: | MOTEUR DE POLITIQUE LOGICIELLE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT VIRTUEL | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2005010804 (BRUENING DEREK L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,17,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0214]; figures 1,3-10 * [Y] 3,4,11,12,19,20 [I] 5-8,13-16; | [A]US2015332043 (RUSSELLO GIOVANNI [NZ]) [A] 1,2,6-10,14-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0144] ** paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0297] *; | [YA] - Anonymous, "Sensors Overview | Android Developers", (20180915), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20180915192236/https://developer.android.com/guide/topics/sensors/sensors_overview, (20191023), XP055635070 [Y] 3,4,11,12,19,20 * Section "Test with the Android Emulator" * [A] 1,9,17 | [A] - Robert N.M. Watson, "New approaches to operating system security extensibility", New approaches to operating system security extensibility, Cambridge, University of Cambridge, Computer Laboratory, Report Number UCAM-CL-TR-818, (20120401), pages 1 - 184, XP055059179 [A] 1-20 * Sections 1 and 5 * |