EP3850915 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FLASHLAMP CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovak GmbH Zum Teich 4 01723 Grumbach / DE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHMANN, Udo Am Stadtpark 2 01723 Wilsdruff / DE | 02 /
OCHLICH, Georg Steinbacher Weg 2a 01723 Kesselsdorf / DE | 03 /
NEUBERT, Marcel Poststrasse 2a 01731 Kreischa / DE | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstraße 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19779748.3 | 13.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP00265 | Priority number, date | EP20180194343 | 13.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18194343 | [2021/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052798 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850915 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/30 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
H05B41/30 (EP,KR);
H05B41/34 (US);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BLITZLAMPENSTEUERUNG | [2021/29] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FLASHLAMP CONTROL | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE DE COMMANDE DE LAMPE ÉCLAIR | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 08.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2024 | Decision despatched | 03.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4687971 (SHIMIZU NORIMITSU [JP]); | [XY]WO2009095584 (UNIV PARIS SUD [FR], et al); | [A]EP2605623 (UAB EKSPLA [LT], et al); |