EP3864287 - TOWERS COMPRISING A MAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alimak Group Management AB Brunkebergstorg 5 111 51 Stockholm / SE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLOMA CALVO, Jesús Angel Los Angeles 88, Nave 1 50198 LA MUELA / ES | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19780267.1 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77241 | Priority number, date | EP20180382716 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18382716 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074526 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864287 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/20, F03D13/10 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | TÜRME MIT EINEM MASTEN | [2021/33] | English: | TOWERS COMPRISING A MAST | [2021/33] | French: | TOURS COMPRENANT UN MÂT | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102010048547 (KGW SCHWERINER MASCHINEN UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0035] - [0037] - [0 41] - [0043]; figures 5-8 *; | [XI]US2009284012 (MORTENSEN HENNING [DK]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0034] , [0058]; figures 20,28,34 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2015292263 (HIERL MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,12,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048] - [0 50] , [0 58]; figures 1-10 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2011252720 (KRISTENSEN JONAS [DK]) [X] 1-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031]; figures 2,3 * [I] 8; | [I]DE102009055726 (AERODYN ENG GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6,8-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0029]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]CN107620675 (XINJIANG GOLDWIND SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 5,6,8 * | by applicant | EP20180382716 |