EP3856950 - LOW TEMPERATURE METHODS FOR DEPOSITING INORGANIC PARTICLES ON A METAL SUBSTRATE AND ARTICLES PRODUCED BY THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hoon 112 Saint Andrews Dr. Horseheads, New York 14845 / US | 02 /
PAULSON, Charles Andrew 129 Davis St. Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19780509.6 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US52139 | Priority number, date | US201862738622P | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862738622 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068579 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856950 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/36, B28B3/26, C23C16/46, C23C16/52 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
C23C16/36 (EP,US);
C23C16/46 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (EP,US);
B28B3/269 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (US);
C22C38/04 (US);
C22C38/42 (US);
C22C38/44 (US);
C22C38/46 (US);
C22C38/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGTEMPERATURVERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON ANORGANISCHEN TEILCHEN AUF EINEM METALLSUBSTRAT UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE GEGENSTÄNDE | [2021/31] | English: | LOW TEMPERATURE METHODS FOR DEPOSITING INORGANIC PARTICLES ON A METAL SUBSTRATE AND ARTICLES PRODUCED BY THE SAME | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE POUR LE DÉPÔT DE PARTICULES INORGANIQUES SUR UN SUBSTRAT MÉTALLIQUE ET ARTICLES PRODUITS PAR CEUX-CI | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3637320 (WAKEFIELD GENE F, et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13,14,16-22,30,32,34-38 * column 2, lines 8,15-18,37,51 - column 3, lines 14-22,32,39,62-75 * * column 5, lines 4-10,59,62 - column 7, lines 3,34,56-61 * [Y] 12,15,23-29,39-46; | [XY]US4196233 (BITZER DIETHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,13,16,18,20,21,30,32 * column 1, lines 14-20 - column 2, lines 23-25 * * column 5, lines 1-2,18,24,30-34 - column 6, lines 12-13,41-50; examples 25-27 * [Y] 12,15,23-29,39-46; | [X]US5858463 (OGURA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 31 * column 2, lines 9-10,57-60 - column 3, lines 2-8 * * column 4, lines 38-45 *; | [Y]US6338880 (AKRAM SALMAN [US]) [Y] 12,15,33,40-46 * column 2, lines 45-55 - column 3, lines 1-29 * * column 4, lines 1-32 *; | [XY]EP1226911 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 31 * page 2, lines 35-43; example 1; table 1 * [Y] 23,27-29; | [Y]US6903010 (SANDHU GURTEJ S [US], et al) [Y] 15,33 * column 2, lines 58-61 - column 3, lines 49-50,64-65 ** column 4, line 44 - column 5, lines 47-48 *; | [XY]US2011139958 (VAIDYANATHAN KRISHNA KUMAR [US]) [X] 31 * page 1, paragraphs 3,5 - page 2, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 3, paragraphs 33,36 - page 4, paragraph 42; examples 6,8 * [Y] 24-26,40 | by applicant | US6302679 |