EP3778146 - MOBILE ROBOT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MOBILE ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jaehoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Kyuchun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
WOO, Jongjin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Dongseong IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hyungsub IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 06 /
SHIN, Seungin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 07 /
YU, Kyungman IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 08 /
JEONG, Jaehoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 09 /
NAM, Dongkyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 10 /
PARK, Jongil IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 11 /
JOO, Hyungkook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1 ro, Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19780807.4 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR04057 | Priority number, date | US201862653567P | 06.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653567 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194631 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778146 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778146 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, A01D34/00 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G05D1/0265 (EP);
B25J11/00 (EP,KR);
G05D1/0219 (EP,US);
A01D34/00 (EP);
A01D34/008 (EP,KR,US);
A01D34/86 (US);
B25J19/00 (EP);
B25J19/005 (KR);
B25J9/16 (EP);
B25J9/1664 (KR);
B25J9/1684 (KR);
B60L53/16 (US);
B60L53/36 (US);
G05D1/0038 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/0225 (US);
G05D1/0259 (US);
G05D1/0274 (EP);
G05D1/0276 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US);
B60L2200/40 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | B25J11/00, B25J9/16, B25J19/00, A01D34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILER ROBOTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MOBILEN ROBOTERS | [2021/07] | English: | MOBILE ROBOT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MOBILE ROBOT | [2021/07] | French: | ROBOT MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN ROBOT MOBILE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2020 | Translation filed | 06.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5032775 (MIZUNO SUEYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9-15 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 2, lines 62-66 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 36; figure 24 * [A] 4; | [YA]US6142252 (KINTO YASUHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9-15 * figures 35, 37, 40-42 * [A] 4; | [YA]US2014324246 (BIBER PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 94]; figure 1 *[A] 4; | [YDA]US2018064024 (CHOI KYUCHUN [KR], et al) [YD] 1-3,5,6,9-15 * paragraphs [0070] , [0 72] , [0 93] - [0096] - [ 104] , [ 107] , [ 141] , [ 155] , [ 158] - [163220] - [ 221]; figures 1C, 1E, 4A, 4B * [A] 4 | International search | [A]KR100645815B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See claim 1 and figures 2, 3. *; | [A]KR20090022217 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* See figure 5. *; | [Y]KR20090074545 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0045] and figures 3, 4. *; | [A]KR101513050B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0065]-[0075] and figures 5, 6. *; | [Y]KR20160128123 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0040J, [0043], [0044], [0047], [0068]-[0072], [0078], [0132]-[0138], [0161]-[0167], [0170], [01751, [0195] and figures 1a, 1c, 1e, 2, 4b, 4e, 5a-5d. * | by applicant | KR20150125508 | US2018064024 |