EP3744499 - NONMETALLIC FLEXIBLE PIPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Merchants Heavy Industry (Jiangsu) Co. Ltd. No.1 Xin An Jiang Road, Bin Jiang Street Haimen Nantong, Jiangsu 226121 / CN | For all designated states China University of Petroleum-Beijing 18 Fuxue Road Changping District Beijing 102249 / CN | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Lixin No.1 Xin An Jiang Road, Bin Jiang Street Haimen Jiangsu 226116 / CN | 02 /
CONG, Chuanbo 18 Fuxue Road, Changping Beijing 102249 / CN | 03 /
CAO, Hui 18 Fuxue Road, Changping Beijing 102249 / CN | 04 /
MENG, Xiaoyu 18 Fuxue Road, Changping Beijing 102249 / CN | 05 /
GUO, Qinjing No.1 Xin An Jiang Road, Bin Jiang Street Haimen Jiangsu 226116 / CN | 06 /
ZHOU, Qiong 18 Fuxue Road, Changping Beijing 102249 / CN | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | ZHAOffice SPRL Rue de Bedauwe 13 5030 Gembloux / BE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19781030.2 | 23.04.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019CN83893 | Priority number, date | CN201810301037 | 04.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810301037 | [2020/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192624 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744499 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744499 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/02, B29D23/00, F16L9/12 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
B29C69/00 (EP,CN,NO);
B29C48/0016 (EP,NO);
B29C48/151 (EP,CN,NO);
F16L11/087 (US);
B29C48/09 (EP,CN,NO);
B29C48/23 (EP,NO);
B29C63/105 (EP,CN,NO);
B29D23/001 (EP,NO,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,NO);
B32B25/08 (EP,NO);
B32B25/14 (EP,NO);
B32B27/12 (EP,NO);
B32B27/285 (EP,NO);
B32B27/286 (EP,NO);
B32B27/288 (EP,NO);
B32B27/304 (EP,NO);
B32B27/32 (EP,NO);
B32B27/322 (EP,NO);
B32B27/34 (EP,NO);
B32B27/36 (EP,NO);
B32B27/40 (EP,NO);
B32B29/02 (EP,NO);
B32B3/30 (EP,NO);
B32B5/024 (EP,NO);
B32B5/026 (EP,NO);
B32B5/028 (EP,NO);
B32B5/08 (EP,NO);
B32B5/26 (EP,NO);
B32B7/12 (EP,NO);
F16L11/08 (EP);
F16L11/18 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (EP,NO,US);
B29L2023/005 (CN,NO);
B32B2260/021 (EP,NO);
B32B2260/046 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/02 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/0284 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/101 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/106 (EP,NO);
B32B2262/14 (EP,NO);
B32B2270/00 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/30 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/51 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/54 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/546 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/554 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/714 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,NO);
B32B2307/732 (EP,NO);
B32B2597/00 (EP,NO)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | B29C48/00, B29C48/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTMETALLISCHES FLEXIBLES ROHR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/49] | English: | NONMETALLIC FLEXIBLE PIPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2020/49] | French: | TUYAU FLEXIBLE NON MÉTALLIQUE ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | Translation filed | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2003056845 (FRASER DANA J [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * fig.1 and relating description * [A] 5; | [Y]WO2010095569 (TOYOX KK [JP], et al) [Y] 9* figs.1 (a,b) and relating description: layer no.4 extruded over no.2 and no.3 *; | [A]GB2514785 (WELLSTREAM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 3-5,9,10 * fig.1 and relating description *; | [XYI]CN102889437B (MENG QINGYI) [X] 1,6 * figs. 1,2 and relating description * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0012] , [0024] - [0026] - [0029] - [0046] * [Y] 3,4,9 [I] 2,7,8; | [A]JP2015534006 (-) [A] 2 * paragraph [0012] * | International search | [A]CN102927383 (CHINA NAT OFFSHORE OIL CORP, et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2016089846 (MCCARTNEY STAFFORD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN106287027 (WEIHAI NACHUAN PIPELINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0035-0092, and figures 1 and 2 *; | [Y]CN106979391 (WEIHAI NACHEON PIPE LINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0043-0115, and figures 1 and 2 *; | [PX]CN108527807 (UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM BEIJING, et al) [PX] 1-10* claims 1-10 * | by applicant | CN106287027 |