EP3772951 - METHODS FOR CONTROL OF PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Gene Technology Limited Level 6 400 Collins Street Melbourne VIC 3000 / AU | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, Peter 31 Dover Street, Red Hill Queensland 4059 / AU | 02 /
KLUPACS, Robert 384-388 Albert Street East Melbourne, Victoria 3002 / AU | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 19781629.1 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019AU50300 | Priority number, date | AU20180901151 | 06.04.2018 Original published format: AU 2018901151 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191812 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772951 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/06, A01N25/02, A01P7/04 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A01N35/06 (EP,AU,US);
A01N25/02 (AU)
| C-Set: |
A01N35/06, A01N2300/00, A01N25/02 (AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON SCHÄDLINGEN | [2021/07] | English: | METHODS FOR CONTROL OF PESTS | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES ORGANISMES NUISIBLES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 01.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Source App, "Eucalyptus extract a weapon against Zika", SBS News, (20160804), URL: https://www.sbs.com.au/news/eucalyptus-extract-a-weapon-against-zika, (20210826), XP055835323 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO02089587 (BIOPROSPECT LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-11 * pp6-9, p26 In 28, Examples 1 & 6 *; | [PX]WO2019006514 (BIO GENE TECH LIMITED [AU]) [PX] 1-11 * [0018], Example 5, Figure 1 *; | [PX]WO2019006516 (BIO GENE TECH LIMITED [AU]) [PX] 1-11* [0018], Example 11, Figures 5-6 *; | [X] - Abderrahmane Kassimi, Lahcen El Watik, Mohamed Moumni, "Insecticide potency on alfalfa aphids of kanuka, ravintsara and tea tree essential oils and neem vegetable oil", Journal of Environmental Solutions, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 2174-8381, pages 16 - 22, XP055746769 [X] 1-11 * . Abstract, Sections II.1.3, II.2, II.3.2 & III.l, Table 1 * | [X] - Hiromi Ikeura; Kobayashi Fumiyuki; Hayata Yasuyoshi, "Repellent Effect of Herb Extracts on the Population of Wingless Green Peach Aphid, Myzus persicae Sulzer (Hemiptera: Aphididae", Journal of Agricultural Science, (20120401), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:10.5539/jas.v4n5p139, ISSN 1916-9752, pages 139 - 144, XP055642139 [X] 1-11 * . Abstract, Sections 2.3, 2.6, Tables 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5539/jas.v4n5p139 | [X] - Pathipati Usha Rani , "Systemic toxicity of different plant derived chemicals and essential oils against safflower aphid, Uroleucon carthami (Homoptera: Aphididae)", Indian Journal of Entomology, IN, (20031130), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0970-9509, pages 345 - 348, XP009523929 [X] 1-8 & 11 * Abstract, Materials and Methods * | [X] - Peter Nay, "New beta-triketone insecticides offer novel mode of action to control resistant insects", (20161130), pages 1 - 2, International Pest Control, URL: http://bio-gene.com.au/wp-content/uploads/2017/06/161224-IPC_NovDec16_p310-311_New-B-triketone-insecticides...._P-May.pdf, XP055642133 [X] 1-6 & 11 * . whole document * | [A] - Chung Gyoo Park , Miyeon Jang , Eunsik Shin , Jumheon Kim , "Myrtaceae Plant Essential Oils and their beta-Triketone Components as Insecticides against Drosophila suzukii", Molecules, (20170000), vol. 22, no. 1050, doi:10.3390/molecules22071050, pages 1 - 10, XP055565013 [A] * . Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules22071050 | [A] - Sameza Modeste Lambert; Bedine Boat Marie Ampere; Tchameni Nguemezi Séverin; Nguemnang Mabou Lile Christere; Jazet Dongmo Pierre Michel; Boyom Fabrice Fekam; Menut Chantal, "Potential use of Eucalyptus globulus essential oil against Phytophthora colocasiae the causal agent of taro leaf blight", European Journal of Plant Pathology, (20140525), vol. 140, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s10658-014-0457-y, ISSN 0929-1873, pages 243 - 250, XP035377737 [A] * . Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10658-014-0457-y |