EP3780178 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE SUBSTANCE FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOCHIO, Takaya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OGASAWARA, Takeshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19781698.6 | 26.02.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP07310 | Priority number, date | JP20180070906 | 02.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018070906 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019193875 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780178 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M10/0525, C01G53/00, // H01M4/86 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
C01G53/42 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2002/74 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2004/8689 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01M4/525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVSUBSTANZ FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2021/07] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE SUBSTANCE FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/07] | French: | SUBSTANCE ACTIVE D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016175268 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US2018040882 (KIM DONGHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0060] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraphs [0113] - [0122] * * examples 1-8 *; | [P]US2018215629 (HONMA TAKEHIDE [JP], et al) [P] * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] ** paragraphs [0073] - [0080] * | International search | [Y]JP2015125833 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0008], [0009], [0029] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016110889 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [A] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0005], [0006], [0009]-[0012], [0030], [0084], table 3, comparative examples 4, 5 & US 2016/0164094 A1, paragraphs [0006], [0007], [0010]-[0016], [0049], [0116], table 3, reference example 3, comparative example 2 & EP 3032618 A2 & CN 105702952 A & KR 10-2016-0069992 A *; | [A]WO2017110063 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-2* , paragraphs [0010], [0019]-[0022], [0035]-[0038] & US 2018/0375096 A1, paragraphs [0012], [0022]-[0025], [0038]-[0040] & CN 108292750 A *; | [XY]JP2018022689 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0022], [0027], [0028], [0050], [0072], [0081], [0082], [0096], [0097] & US 2018/0040882 A1, paragraphs [0059], [0068], [0069], [0081], [0114], [0122], [0123], [0137]-[0139] & EP 3279144 A1 & KR 10-2018-0015575 A & CN 107689447 A * [Y] 1-2 | by applicant | JP2006202702 | JP2010070431 |