EP3780752 - ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states China Academy of Telecommunications Technology No.40 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing, 100191 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jiamin No.40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Dajun No.40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Ying No.40 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19781813.1 | 15.02.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN75191 | Priority number, date | CN201810302002 | 04.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810302002 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192269 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780752 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W48/08, H04B7/155, // H04W88/14, H04W84/04, H04W92/20, H04W92/24 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H04B7/15557 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W48/08 (EP);
H04W48/17 (CN,KR);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W84/047 (KR);
H04W88/14 (US);
H04W92/20 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | ZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | Translation filed | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2560452 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US9179444 (VAN PHAN VINH [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 19; figure 3 * * column 12, lines 43-62 *; | [IY]US2018092139 (NOVLAN THOMAS DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * [Y] 3,4,11,13; | [Y] - ERICSSON, "Functional split between IAB node and other network nodes", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-181311 CU-DU SPLIT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180217), XP051401755 [Y] 3,4,11,13 * chapters 4 and 5 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Setup procedures for IAB-node and a UE connected to an IAB node", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-181313 SETUP PROCEDURES FOR IAB-NODE AND A UE CONNECTED TO AN IAB NODE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-AN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180217), XP051401757 [A] 6,8 * chapter 3 * * chapter 3.1 * * chapter 3.2 * | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On RAN architecture for IAB relaying in NR", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180216), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-181351_IAB_ARCHITECTURE_V3_1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180216), XP051401582 [A] 1-15 * chapter 2 RAN architecture * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Overall high layer design of IAB", vol. RAN WG2, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20170122 - 20170126, (20170112), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1801131 OVERALL HIGH LAYER DESIGN OF IAB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5FAHs/2018%5F01%5FNR/Docs/, (20170112), XP051386602 [A] 1-15 * chapter 2.1 * * chapter 2.2.3 * * chapter 2.3.2 * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Destination Address and Forwarding Path based Routing for IAB", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180214), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180816 ROUTING DESIGN FOR IAB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180214), XP051401229 [A] 1-15 * chapter 1 and ANNEX 9.x * | International search | [A]WO2010057521 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-31 * entire document *; | [A]CN103069860 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY) [A] 1-31* entire document *; | [Y] - NOKIA et al., "IAB Discovery and Route Selection", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3#99 R3-181361, (20180302), XP051401796 [Y] 1-31 * , sections 2-5 * | [Y] - HUAWEI, "Some Issues Concerning RN Startup", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #69bis R2-102008, (20100416), XP050422300 [Y] 1-31 * , section 2 * | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "Overall High Layer Design of IAB", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Ad Hoc R2-1801131, (20170126), XP051386602 [A] 1-31 * , entire document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Architecture for Integrated Access and Backhaul", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 NR AH1801 R2-1801022, (20180126), XP051386522 [A] 1-31 * , entire document * | [A] - CATT, "IAB Network Architecture and Protocol Stack", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3-AH-1801 R3-180831, (20180302), XP051401193 [A] 1-31 * , entire document * |