EP3761979 - USE OF GABOXADOL IN THE TREATMENT OF SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovid Therapeutics Inc. 1460 Broadway New York, New York 10036 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURING, Matthew 14 Cedar Lane Weston, Connecticut 06883 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19781960.0 | 06.04.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US26218 | Priority number, date | US201862653641P | 06.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653641 P | US201862654786P | 09.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862654786 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019195813 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761979 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/437, A61K45/06, A61P25/30, A61P25/32, A61P25/34, A61P25/36 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/36 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | A61K31/437, A61K45/06, A61P3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON GABOXADOL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SUBSTANZMISSBRAUCH | [2021/02] | English: | USE OF GABOXADOL IN THE TREATMENT OF SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | [2021/02] | French: | UTILISATION DE GABOXADOL DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES LIÉS À L'USAGE DE SUBSTANCES | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 07.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0108675 (MOLTENI & C [IT], et al) [I] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [I]US2002042446 (DEWEY STEPHEN L [US], et al) [I] 1-11* claims 1, 5, 15, 17 * | International search | [A]US2002165217 (HOWARD HARRY R [US]) [A] 1-40 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2005192271 (LEGARDA IBANEZ JUAN J [ES]) [A] 1-40* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2008207601 (SABNANI SANJAY [US]) [Y] 7-40 * ; Claim 48, para[0032], para[0049], para[0170], para[0171], para[0197] *; | [X]US2009203731 (SANCHEZ CONNIE [DK], et al) [X] 1-6 * ; para[0009], para[0017], para[0018], para[0037] *; | [Y]US2011082171 (FERGUSON MARK WILLIAM JAMES [GB], et al) [Y] 7-40 * ; Abstract *; | [A]US2013053435 (LIANG JING [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * ; entire document * |