EP3738338 - METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING LOGGED MEASUREMENT ENTRY AND DEVICE SUPPORTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sangwon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19782117.6 | 02.04.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019KR03835 | Priority number, date | KR20180038329 | 02.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180038329 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194518 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738338 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W76/27 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | H04W24/10, H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES EINTRAGS EINER PROTOKOLLIERTEN MESSUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DAVON | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING LOGGED MEASUREMENT ENTRY AND DEVICE SUPPORTING THE SAME | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION D'ENTRÉE DE MESURE JOURNALISÉE, ET DISPOSITIF PRENANT EN CHARGE LE PROCÉDÉ | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 05.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2624621 (NEC CORP [JP]); | International search | [A]US2013252605 (LEE SUNG MIN [KR], et al); | [A]US2014056168 (JUNG SUNG HOON [KR], et al); | by applicant | EP2624621 |