EP3773312 - IMPROVED FLUIDIC DRIVERS, DEVICES, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS FOR CATHETERS AND OTHER USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Project Moray, Inc. 3603 Hillcrest Drive Belmont, California 94002 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, Miles D. 780 Saltillo Place Fremont, California 94536 / US | 02 /
LABY, Keith Phillip 12 Ascot Lane Oakland, California 94611 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Ronald 149 Campo Bello Lane Menlo Park, California 94062 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19782336.2 | 08.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US26360 | Priority number, date | US201862654092P | 06.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862654092 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019195841 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773312 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B46/23, A61B46/00, A61B46/10, A61B46/13, A61B46/17, A61B50/00, A61B34/30 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61M25/0155 (US);
A61B46/10 (EP);
A61B46/13 (US);
A61B46/23 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP);
A61B2017/00544 (EP);
A61B2034/301 (EP);
A61M25/0133 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61B46/23, A61B46/00, A61B46/10, A61B46/13, A61B46/17, A61B50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE FLUIDISCHE TREIBER, VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR KATHETER UND ANDERE VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/07] | English: | IMPROVED FLUIDIC DRIVERS, DEVICES, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS FOR CATHETERS AND OTHER USES | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ENTRAÎNEMENT FLUIDIQUE AMÉLIORÉS, DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR CATHÉTERS ET AUTRES UTILISATIONS | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007239172 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0 63] - [0065]; figures 2,16B * [A] 1; | [Y]US2013172812 (KIRSCHENMAN MARK B [US]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0051]; figures 5-7 *; | [XA]US2016361124 (DACHS II GREGORY W [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0043] - [0046]; figures 5,6 * [A] 1; | [XA]WO2017205308 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0220] , [0221]; figures 2,7,8,13,17 *[A] 1; | [Y]GB2553879 (CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL ROBOTICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-12 * page 26, line 10 - line 14 * * page 28, line 9 - line 19; figure 14 *; | [XY]WO2018064400 (PROJECT MORAY INC [US]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0246] - [0252]; figures 29A,30A-30D * [Y] 1-12 | International search | [XY]US2007239172 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [X] 13 * entire document * [Y] 1-7, 11, 21; | [A]US2010170519 (ROMO ENRIQUE [US], et al) [A] 1-13, 21, 22 * entire document *; | [X]US2013331858 (DEVENGENZO ROMAN L [US], et al) [X] 22 * entire document *; | [A]US2016361128 (SEEBER MARCEL [DE]) [A] 1-13, 21, 22 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2018064400 (PROJECT MORAY INC [US]) [Y] 1-7, 11, 21 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018064398 (PROJECT MORAY INC [US]) [A] 1-13, 21, 22* entire document * | by applicant | GB2553879 | WO2018064400 |