EP3793804 - DEVICE FOR FORMING PLASTIC PREFORMS INTO PLASTIC CONTAINERS, A BLOW MOULD, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELTINGER, Florian Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Hannke Bittner & Partner mbB Regensburg Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/12] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19782506.0 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019EP75857 | Priority number, date | DE201810123624 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018123624 | [2021/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064834 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793804 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3793804 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/48, B29C49/06 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B29C49/48 (EP);
B29C49/54 (US);
B29C2049/4892 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP);
B29L2031/7158 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMFORMEN VON KUNSTSTOFFVORFORMLINGEN ZU KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTNISSEN SOWIE EINE BLASFORM UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEHÄLTNISSES | [2021/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR FORMING PLASTIC PREFORMS INTO PLASTIC CONTAINERS, A BLOW MOULD, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONTAINER | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MOULER DES ÉBAUCHES EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE EN RÉCIPIENTS EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE ET MOULE DE SOUFFLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉALISER DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 14.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4547333 (TAKADA TAKUZO [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]US5122327 (SPINA DENNIS R [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5968560 (BRIERE DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X]US2015298386 (LETESTU MICKAEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]US2017232656 (DERRIEN MIKAEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | US2006093699 | US8550803 | US2015061196 | US2017173845 |