EP3853069 - LIGHT-GUIDING RADIATOR GRILL FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/30] | LIGHT-GUIDING RADIATOR GRILL HAVING A PLATE-TYPE OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE | ||
[2023/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skoda Auto A.S. Tr. Václava Klementa 869 293 01 Mladá Boleslav II / CZ | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMULE, Michal Vrchlického 990 508 01 Horice / CZ | 02 /
KOVÁR, Pavel 17. listopadu 1471 293 01 Mladá Boleslav / CZ | 03 /
RUZICKA, Zdenek 294 01 Brezno 262 / CZ | 04 /
NEVRELA, Petr Stojanova 412/8 746 01 Opava / CZ | 05 /
BEZDECNY, Roman Albrechtice u Frýdlantu 30 463 31 Frýdlant / CZ | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19782897.3 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019CZ00045 | Priority number, date | CZ20180000478 | 17.09.2018 Original published format: CZ 20180478 | [2021/30] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020057675 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853069 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3853069 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/26, B60Q1/28, F21S43/239, F21S43/243, F21S43/249, F21S43/14, F21S43/251, F21S43/27, F21S43/31, F21S45/37, B60R19/52 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B60Q1/2661 (EP);
B60Q1/28 (EP);
B60R19/52 (EP,CZ);
F21S41/143 (CZ);
F21S41/24 (CZ);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/239 (EP,CZ);
F21S43/243 (EP);
F21S43/249 (EP);
F21S43/251 (EP);
F21S43/27 (EP);
F21S43/31 (EP);
F21S43/50 (CZ);
F21S45/37 (EP);
B60R2019/525 (EP);
F21W2104/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTLEITENDER KÜHLERGRILL FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2023/12] | English: | LIGHT-GUIDING RADIATOR GRILL FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/12] | French: | CALANDRE DE GUIDAGE DE LUMIÈRE POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/30] | LICHTLEITENDER KÜHLERGRILL MIT EINEM PLATTENFÖRMIGEN LICHTLEITER | ||
Former [2021/30] | LIGHT-GUIDING RADIATOR GRILL HAVING A PLATE-TYPE OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE | ||
Former [2021/30] | CALANDRE DE GUIDAGE DE LUMIÈRE COMPRENANT UN GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE EN FORME DE PLAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | IE | 11.09.2023 | LU | 11.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
IE | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
IE | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4977487 (OKANO SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, lines 40-47; figures 19a-20b ** column 9, lines 40-68 *; | [XI]JP2012113970 (SAKAE RIKEN KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6,12,13 * siehe beigelegte maschinelle Übersetzung; paragraphs [0012] - [0036]; figures 1-11 * [I] 7; | [XI]DE202012008792U (COPLUS INC [TW]) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0037]; figures 1-10 * [I] 13; | [X]JP2013095216 (SAKAE RIKEN KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1-4,13 * siehe beigelegte maschinelle Übersetzung; paragraphs [0004] , [0016] - [0021]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE202017102639U (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 5,8,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0022]; figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]EP3190006 (SMR PATENTS SARL [LU]) [X] 1-4,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0014] , [0016] - [0044]; figures 1-18 * [Y] 5,8,13 [I] 7,10 |