EP3860944 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COVERING MATERIAL FOR A COVERING, COVERING MATERIAL FOR A COVERING, AND VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adient US LLC 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2022/25] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states Adient Engineering and IP GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAHR, Daniel Koelner Strasse 414 51515 Kuerten / DE | 02 /
FROTZ, Thomas Ringstrasse 15 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 03 /
HENNIG, Lars Altenbach 2 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
SCHULZE, Uwe Amselstrasse 13 51149 Koeln / DE | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Liedhegener, Ralf Adient Components Ltd. & Co. KG IP Operations Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19782950.0 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019EP76162 | Priority number, date | DE201810124540 | 04.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018124540 | [2021/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069991 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860944 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B68G15/00, B60N2/58 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B60N2/5891 (EP,US);
B60N2/5816 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEZUGSMATERIALS FÜR EINEN BEZUG, BEZUGSMATERIAL FÜR EINEN BEZUG, SOWIE FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2021/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COVERING MATERIAL FOR A COVERING, COVERING MATERIAL FOR A COVERING, AND VEHICLE SEAT | [2021/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU DE HOUSSE POUR UNE HOUSSE, MATÉRIAU DE HOUSSE POUR UNE HOUSSE ET SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 04.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/32] | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH0538388 (ARACO CORP) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; figure - * [A] 1-12; | [A]US2007028435 (ORMACHEA RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-14* columns 1,2; figure - *; | [A]KR101828416B (DAE HYUN MACHINERY CO [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figure - *; | [A] - Jenny Lee, "Automatic Pattern Sewing on Car Seat Cover with Richpeace heavy material Automatic Sewing Machine", Youtube, (20141224), page 1 pp., URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=XUVSv2DIrRo, (20191120), XP054979924 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Freeman Schwabe - SCHWABE USA, "Seat Cover Embossing Demo on Hydraulic Platen Press", Youtube, (20180629), page 2 pp., URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=gS_60m992Bc, (20191120), XP054979926 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3841700 |