EP3874559 - CONDUCTIVE LIQUID ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKHMAD, Mohammed-Asif BAE Systems Applied Intelligence West Hanningfield Road Great Baddow, Great Baddow Chelmsford Essex CM2 8HN / GB | 02 /
PINTO, Jonathan BAE SYSTEMS Applied Intelligence West Hanningfield Road Great Baddow Chelmsford Essex CM2 8HN / GB | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19783098.7 | 07.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019GB52823 | Priority number, date | GB20180017619 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201817619 | EP20180275166 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18275166 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020089578 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874559 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3874559 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, // H01Q9/40, H01Q9/04 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H01Q1/364 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US);
H01Q9/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H01Q1/36, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE MIT LEITFÄHIGER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2021/36] | English: | CONDUCTIVE LIQUID ANTENNA | [2021/36] | French: | ANTENNE DE LIQUIDE CONDUCTEUR | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/36] | ANTENNE LIQUIDE CONDUCTRICE | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23166912.8 / EP4235962 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | LU | 07.10.2023 | FR | 09.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 07.10.2023 | ||
FR | 09.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 07.10.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004252069 (RAWNICK JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2014078019 (KIM HOSAENG [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,15 * figures 1(b),6 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0054] * [I] 7; | [X]CN103794844 (ACER INC) [X] 1,2,4,5,15 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI] - BHARAMBE VIVEK ET AL, "Reversibly Reconfigurable Liquid Metal Patch Antenna Using A Superhydrophobic Spray-Coating", 2018 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION & USNC/URSI NATIONAL RADIO SCIENCE MEETING, IEEE, (20180708), doi:10.1109/APUSNCURSINRSM.2018.8608814, pages 287 - 288, XP033496658 [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * figures 1,4 * * pages 287-288 * [I] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APUSNCURSINRSM.2018.8608814 | [XI] - ALQURASHI KHALED YAHYA ET AL, "Continuously tunable frequency reconfigurable liquid metal microstrip patch antenna", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION & USNC/URSI NATIONAL RADIO SCIENCE MEETING, IEEE, (20170709), doi:10.1109/APUSNCURSINRSM.2017.8072497, pages 909 - 910, XP033229714 [X] 1,2,5,14 * figure 1 * * pages 909-910 * [I] 3,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APUSNCURSINRSM.2017.8072497 | [X] - LEI XING ET AL, "A monopole water antenna", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION CONFERENCE (LAPC), 2012 LOUGHBOROUGH, IEEE, (20121112), doi:10.1109/LAPC.2012.6402985, ISBN 978-1-4673-2218-8, pages 1 - 4, XP032299086 [X] 1-4,15 * figure 2 * * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LAPC.2012.6402985 | by applicant | GB2435720 | WO2014042486 |