EP3824001 - TETRAFLUROETHYLENE FLUOROPOLYMERS CONTAINING PERFLUORINATED ALLYL ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOCHUM, Florian D. Sierstorpffstrasse 31 55262 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
HINTZER, Klaus Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 03 /
DADALAS, Michael C. Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 04 /
DAHLKE, Gregg D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
JARIWALA, Chetan P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SCOTT, Peter J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19783103.5 | 12.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019IB55974 | Priority number, date | US201862701311P | 20.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862701311 P | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020016719 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824001 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/26, C09D127/14 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C09D127/14 (EP);
C08F214/26 (EP);
D06M15/277 (EP);
D06M2200/01 (EP);
D06M2200/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | TETRAFLUORETHYLEN-FLUORPOLYMERE MIT PERFLUORIERTEN ALLYL-ETHERN | [2021/21] | English: | TETRAFLUROETHYLENE FLUOROPOLYMERS CONTAINING PERFLUORINATED ALLYL ETHERS | [2021/21] | French: | FLUOROPOLYMÈRES DE TÉTRAFLUROÉTHYLÈNE CONTENANT DES ÉTHERS ALLYLIQUES PERFLUORÉS | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 19.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004244504 (YUNIMATEKKU KK) [X] 1-4,11-13 * examples 1,2 * * table 1 * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [XI]WO2015088784 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-4,9,13 * claims 1,3,9,10,11,12 * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0014] * * example 2 *[I] 5-8,10,14-19 | by applicant | US3037953 | US4369266 | US4675380 | EP0226668 | US4743658 | DE19547909 | US5910557 | EP1155055 | WO2007142888 | WO2013162704 | US9175113 | EP3059265 | EP3284762 | WO2018034839 |