EP3856600 - METHOD FOR CALCULATING A MANAGEMENT SETPOINT FOR THE COMSUMPTION OF FUEL AND ELECTRIC CURRENT BY A HYBRID MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OURABAH, Abdel-Djalil 10 rue Bobillot 75013 Paris / FR | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/31] | 01 /
OURABAH, Abdel-Djalil 10 rue Bobillot 75013 PARIS / FR | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19783224.9 | 23.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019EP75449 | Priority number, date | FR20180058734 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858734 | [2021/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064586 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856600 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/12, B60W10/26 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B60W20/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60W20/13 (KR,US);
B60W50/0097 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2050/0013 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2050/0025 (EP,KR);
B60W2050/0026 (EP,KR);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60W2510/0623 (EP,KR);
B60W2510/244 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2552/05 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,KR);
B60W2552/30 (EP,KR);
B60W2555/60 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2556/10 (EP,KR);
B60W2556/50 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2710/244 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/92 (KR,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/62 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/84 (EP,KR);
Y04S10/126 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BERECHNUNG EINES VERWALTUNGSSOLLWERTS FÜR DEN KRAFTSTOFFVERBRAUCH UND DEN ELEKTRISCHEN STROM DURCH EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2021/31] | English: | METHOD FOR CALCULATING A MANAGEMENT SETPOINT FOR THE COMSUMPTION OF FUEL AND ELECTRIC CURRENT BY A HYBRID MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL D'UNE CONSIGNE DE GESTION DE LA CONSOMMATION EN CARBURANT ET EN COURANT ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE HYBRIDE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2857271 (MAN TRUCK & BUS AG [DE]); | [X]DE102013225558 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [I]FR3061470 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) | by applicant | FR2988674 | WO2013150206 | WO2014001707 | US9108503 |