EP3860933 - CONTAINER AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mubea Carbo Tech GmbH Eugen-Müller-Strasse 16 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGENHOFER, Daniel Pichl 90 5441 Abtenau / AT | 02 /
HEIGL, Christian Hofmarkstrasse 27 94405 Landau an der Isar / DE | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19783266.0 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019EP76693 | Priority number, date | CH20180001200 | 02.10.2018 Original published format: CH 12002018 | CH20190000538 | 18.04.2019 Original published format: CH 5382019 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020070185 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860933 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/14, B65D90/02, B65D90/08 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B65D88/14 (EP,US);
B65D90/08 (EP,US);
B65D90/021 (US);
B65D90/022 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND VERBINDERANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2021/32] | English: | CONTAINER AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTAINER | [2021/32] | French: | CONTENEUR ET ENSEMBLE RACCORD DE CONTENEUR | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 22.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4331835 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]); | [XAI]WO2010097378 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012168305 (TELAIR INT GMBH [DE], et al); | [AD]WO2013142096 (LEADING LITE COMPOSITES LLC [US]) | by applicant | WO2013142096 |