EP3863449 - AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE FOR INDUCTIVE HEATING OF AN AEROSOL-FORMING SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HR, NO, PL, RS | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products, S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCIO, Dani Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
COURBAT, Jerome, Christian Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
STURA, Enrico Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 19783328.8 | 10.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77437 | Priority number, date | EP20180199781 | 11.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18199781 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074622 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863449 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3863449 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/465, H05B6/36, H05B6/10, // A24F40/20 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H05B6/108 (EP);
A24F40/465 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR,US);
H05B6/105 (KR,US);
H05B6/36 (EP,KR);
H05B6/365 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | A24F47/00, H05B6/36, H05B6/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR INDUKTIVEN ERWÄRMUNG EINES AEROSOLBILDENDEN SUBSTRATS | [2021/33] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE FOR INDUCTIVE HEATING OF AN AEROSOL-FORMING SUBSTRATE | [2021/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL POUR LE CHAUFFAGE INDUCTIF D'UN SUBSTRAT DE FORMATION D'AÉROSOL | [2023/22] |
Former [2021/33] | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AÉROSOL POUR CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION D'UN SUBSTRAT DE FORMATION D'AÉROSOL | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 04.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014261495 (NOVAK III CHARLES JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]CN206137197U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]WO2018041450 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 13, line 32 - page 17, line 12 * * page 18, line 18 - page 23, line 34 * |