EP3785278 - METHOD PROVIDING ECG ANALYSIS INTERFACE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peacs Investments B.V. Weijland 38 2415 BC Nieuwerbrug aan den Rijn / NL | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DAM, Peter Michael Weijland 38 2415 BC Nieuwerbrug aan den Rijn / NL | 02 /
VAN DAM, Eelco Mattias Weijland 38 2415 BC Nieuwerbrug aan den Rijn / NL | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Hoeben, Ferdinand Egon Allied Patents B.V. Postbus 1551 1200 BN Hilversum / NL | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19783387.4 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019NL50244 | Priority number, date | NL20182020827 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: NL 2020827 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019209109 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3785278 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/63 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
A61B5/364 (US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/339 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G16H15/00 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H40/40 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/50 (US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
G06T2210/41 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON EKG-ANALYSE-SCHNITTSTELLE UND SYSTEM | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD PROVIDING ECG ANALYSIS INTERFACE AND SYSTEM | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ FOURNISSANT UNE INTERFACE D'ANALYSE D'ECG ET SYSTÈME | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 25.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007232946 (FEILD DIRK Q [US], et al) [I] 1-9,14,18-20,23,25 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2010018566 (AMITAI DAVID [IL], et al) [A] 1,23,25 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]US2002026220 (GROENEWEGEN ARNE SIPPENS [US], et al) [A] 1,23,25 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2014194760 (ALBERT DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,23,25 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2008032234 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 10-13,15-17,21,22,24 * page 1, line 26 - page 3, line 24 * * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 20 * |