EP3747073 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FUEL CELL SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstraße 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Nikola Corporation 4141 East Broadway Road Phoenix, AZ 85040 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNK, Kevin 3531 E Modoc Ct Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Jesse 1852 W. Thompson Way Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | 03 /
IMRE, Arpad Salzaeckerstr. 32/2 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 04 /
BELSCHNER, Werner Eichweg 2 74544 Michelbach An Der Bilz / DE | 05 /
ECKERT, Peter Holdergasse 2 74626 Bretzfeld / DE | 06 /
HEYSE, Jörg Elser-Ring 22 74354 Besigheim / DE | [2021/28] |
Former [2020/50] | 01 /
LYNK, Kevin 3531 E Modoc Ct Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US | ||
02 /
SCHNEIDER, Jesse 2222 S. Dobson Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | |||
03 /
IMRE, Arpad Salzaeckerstr. 32/2 71665 Vaihingen / DE | |||
04 /
BELSCHNER, Werner Eichweg 2 74544 Michelbach An Der Bilz / DE | |||
05 /
ECKERT, Peter Holdergasse 2 74626 Bretzfeld / DE | |||
06 /
HEYSE, Jörg Elser-Ring 22 74354 Besigheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19783642.2 | 28.08.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019IB57250 | Priority number, date | DE201810214643 | 29.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018214643 | [2020/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020044259 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747073 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3747073 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04007, H01M8/043, H01M8/249 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H01M8/04037 (EP);
B60L58/33 (US);
B60H1/143 (US);
B60L58/34 (US);
H01M8/04029 (US);
H01M8/043 (EP);
H01M8/04723 (US);
H01M8/249 (EP);
B60L2240/36 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMS FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2020/50] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A FUEL CELL SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2019 | AL | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | IE | 28.08.2021 | LU | 28.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.08.2019 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 28.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 28.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 28.08.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 28.08.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 14.07.2021 | |
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010297515 (ERIKSTRUP NIELS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1, 3, 5-12 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0024] - [0027] - [0074] - [0081] *; | [XY]DE102012007382 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 13,14 * claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 12 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0017] - [0025] * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]JP2016031841 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1, 7, 10 ** paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0052] , [0053] *; | [XY]DE102016115789 (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [X] 13,14 * claims 1-3, 6-8, 10 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0023] - [0051] - [0058] * [Y] 1-12 | by applicant | EP2287952 |