EP4042409 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN INSTABILITY OF AN ENGINE-ORDER-CANCELLATION ("EOC") APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASK Industries GmbH Hauptstrasse 73 94559 Niederwinkling / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALINICHENKO, Victor c/o Hauptstraße 73 94559 Niederwinkling / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 19784036.6 | 07.10.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019EP77024 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069050 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042409 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4042409 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G10K11/17835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER INSTABILITÄT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR MOTORORDNUNGSUNTERDRÜCKUNG (EOC) | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN INSTABILITY OF AN ENGINE-ORDER-CANCELLATION ("EOC") APPARATUS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UNE INSTABILITÉ D'UN APPAREIL DE SUPPRESSION D'HARMONIQUES DE MOTEUR (EOC) | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/33] | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UNE INSTABILITÉ D'UN APPAREIL EOC (ENGINE-ORDER-CANCELLATION) | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24177312.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015055787 (GANESHKUMAR ALAGANANDAN [US]) | Examination | US10163432 |