EP3866878 - SYRINGE PACK AND METHOD OF PACKING A PREFILLED SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMONT, Richard c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
CAMMISH, Neil B. c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 03 /
HEMMINGER, Markus c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 04 /
BLINTZ, Cyrille c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 05 /
FELSOVALYI, Flora c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19784077.0 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77810 | Priority number, date | EP20180200428 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200428 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078920 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866878 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
A61M5/3137 (US);
A61M5/31505 (US);
B65B5/04 (US);
A61M2005/3139 (US);
A61M5/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | SPRITZENPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN EINER FERTIGSPRITZE | [2021/34] | English: | SYRINGE PACK AND METHOD OF PACKING A PREFILLED SYRINGE | [2021/34] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE SERINGUES ET PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE DE SERINGUES PRÉREMPLIES | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012056265 (BECTON DICKINSON FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,15-18 * page 15 ff; figure 9 *; | [XI]US2014262884 (PRIEBE ROBERT N [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-14,18,19 * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0167] * [I] 7; | [A]US2018015217 (HASUMI KIYOAKI [JP]) [A] 1-19* figure 7 * |