EP4014662 - INTERFERRENCE DETECTION FOR RANDOM ACCESS FALSE ALARM REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAN, Talha 2755 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
LIBERG, Olof Hornsgatan 45 118 49 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
WANG, Yi-Pin Eric 1357 Grosventres Ct Fremont, California 94539 / US | 04 /
SUI, Yutai Ankdammsgatan 25 lgh 1703 171 67 Solna / SE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 19784125.7 | 16.08.2019 | [2022/25] | WO2019IB56955 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021033009 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014662 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP);
H04L5/0073 (EP);
H04L5/0012 (EP);
H04W72/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | INTERFERENZDETEKTION ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON DIREKTZUGRIFFSFEHLALARMEN | [2022/25] | English: | INTERFERRENCE DETECTION FOR RANDOM ACCESS FALSE ALARM REDUCTION | [2022/25] | French: | DÉTECTION D'INTERFÉRENCE POUR LA RÉDUCTION D'UNE FAUSSE ALARME D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3089521 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-24 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] - [0066] - [0 68] - [0198] *; | [Y]EP3160207 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 1,2,14,15,18,23,24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 13] - [0055] *; | [Y]US2018332589 (WANG XIAO FENG [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,14,15,18,23,24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0 39] - [0080] *; | [Y]WO2019037712 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,14,15,18,23,24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0013] - [0 46] - [0101] * |