EP3773748 - BICISTRONIC AAV VECTORS ENCODING HEXOSAMINIDASE ALPHA AND BETA-SUBUNITS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTEVES, Miguel, Sena 7 Shipley Circle Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
GOLEBIOWSKI, Diane 44 Ossamequin Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19784280.0 | 12.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US27271 | Priority number, date | US201862657243P | 13.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862657243 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019200286 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773748 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N9/24, C12N15/86 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61P25/00 (US);
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01052 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61K48/0075 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2830/205 (EP);
C12N2830/50 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | BICISTRONISCHE AAV-VEKTOREN, DIE HEXOSAMINIDASE ALPHA UND BETA-UNTEREINHEITEN CODIEREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/07] | English: | BICISTRONIC AAV VECTORS ENCODING HEXOSAMINIDASE ALPHA AND BETA-SUBUNITS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/07] | French: | VECTEURS AAV BICISTRONIQUES CODANT POUR DES SOUS-UNITÉS ALPHA ET BÊTA D'HEXOSAMINIDASE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018028685 (WALIA JAGDEEP SINGH [CA]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] - [0012] - [0 29] , [0 49] , [0 66] - [0078] * | International search | [Y]CN1429905 (UNIV BEIJING [CN]) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2, 14-15, 16/14-15 * ; abstract; pages 2/23, 7/23 *; | [Y]US2004192630 (KYRKANIDES STEPHANOS [US]) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2, 14-15, 16/14-15 * ; abstract; figure 1; paragraphs [0007], [0109], [0820], [0822] *; | [Y]US2008226615 (KYRKANIDES STEPHANOS [US]) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2, 14-15, 16/14-15* ; entire document * |