EP3773180 - ASSESSMENT OF CORONARY FUNCTION VIA ADVANCED 3D PRINTED MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornell University CTL 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, James K. 22 North 6th Street Brooklyn New York 11249 / US | 02 /
DUNHAM, Simon Weill Cornell Medical College 413 East 69th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 03 /
MOSADEGH, Bobak Weill Cornell Medical College 413 East 69th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 04 /
KOLLI, Kranthi Kumar 465 Main Street, Apt. 6E New York, NY 10044 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
MIN, James K. 22 North 6th Street Brooklyn New York 11249 / US | ||
02 /
DUNHAM, Simon Weill Cornell Medical College 413 East 69th Street New York New York 10021 / US | |||
03 /
MOSADEGH, Bobak Weill Cornell Medical College 413 East 69th Street New York New York 10021 / US | |||
04 /
KOLLI, Kranthi Kumar 465 Main Street, Apt. 6E New York New York 10044 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/07] | Williams, Annabel Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19784551.4 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US27003 | Priority number, date | US201862656285P | 11.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862656285 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019200108 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773180 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3773180 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/00, G09B23/30 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/029 (EP);
G16H30/20 (US);
A61B6/504 (US);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y50/00 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
G01F9/00 (US);
G01N15/1409 (US);
G09B23/303 (EP);
A61B6/503 (US);
G01N2015/0853 (US);
G01N2015/1027 (US);
G05B2219/49023 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61B5/02, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEURTEILUNG DER KORONARFUNKTION ÜBER ERWEITERTE 3D-DRUCKMODELLE | [2021/07] | English: | ASSESSMENT OF CORONARY FUNCTION VIA ADVANCED 3D PRINTED MODELS | [2021/07] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE LA FONCTION CORONAIRE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DE MODÈLES AVANCÉS IMPRIMÉS EN 3D | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016137425 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE GMBH [DE], et al); | International search | [A]US2016166220 (BAR-SHALEV AVI [IL], et al); | [A]WO2016128965 (ASPECT IMAGING LTD [IL]); | [Y]US2017217102 (MANSI TOMMASO [US], et al); |