EP3780260 - MULTIPLE INPUT AND MULTIPLE OUTPUT ANTENNA APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18462 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Chang Woo 404-1404, 20, Yeongtong-ro 27beon-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18378 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Min Sik 206-1102, 53, Yeongtong-ro 27beon-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18376 / KR | 03 /
YEO, Jin Soo 524-706, 99, Dongtanjungang-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18439 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19785289.0 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR04357 | Priority number, date | KR20180041987 | 11.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180041987 | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019199078 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780260 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/02, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/38, H05K7/20, H01Q21/00, H04B1/40 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01Q21/0025 (EP);
H01Q1/02 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0204 (US);
H01Q1/38 (KR);
H01Q1/42 (KR);
H01Q21/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01Q1/02, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN EINGÄNGEN UND MEHREREN AUSGÄNGEN | [2021/07] | English: | MULTIPLE INPUT AND MULTIPLE OUTPUT ANTENNA APPARATUS | [2021/07] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANTENNE À ENTRÉES MULTIPLES ET SORTIES MULTIPLES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2020 | Translation filed | 20.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 29.05.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017086377 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [XAYI]WO2018043999 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [XYA]KR20180024674 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-2 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0073], claim 1 and figures 2-4. * [Y] 3 [A] 4-16; | [Y]WO2017086377 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0055], claim 1 and figure 10. *; | [A]KR20140018115 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0019], claims 1-3 and figures 2-3. *; | [A]JP2017063288 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0058], claims 1-3 and figures 3-5. *; | [A]JP2017046121 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0025] and figure 3. * |