EP3775827 - APPARATUS FOR OPTICAL TESTING OF PLATE-SHAPED OPTICAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | OPTICAL SAMPLE CHARACTERIZATION | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumus Ltd. 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDAAG, Chaim 10 Hachita St. 7635240 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
LAVI, Tzofia 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 03 /
HERMONI, Dror Kibbutz Usha / IL | 04 /
GELBERG, Jonathan 32 Yael Hagibora St. 7172939 Modiin / IL | 05 /
LAVIAN, Yosef Mizrach Benyamin 19 9063100 Bet-El / IL | 06 /
GOLDSTEIN, Netanel 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 07 /
SHARLIN, Elad Nahal 7d 7684100 Mishmar David I / IL | 08 /
LAVI, Elad 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 09 /
GREENSTEIN, Kobi 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 10 /
SHAPIRA, Amir 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 11 /
GILO, Mordechai 8 Pinhas Sapir Street 7403631 Ness Ziona / IL | 12 /
EISENFELD, Tsion Harav Norok Street 32/10 7835515 Ashkelon / IL | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19785682.6 | 07.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019IB52852 | Priority number, date | US201862654460P | 08.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862654460 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197959 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775827 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3775827 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55, G01N21/59, G01N21/84 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G01N21/55 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N21/8422 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/59 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01M11/02 (IL,KR);
G02B27/30 (IL,US);
G01N2021/8427 (EP,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G01M11/02, G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM OPTISCHEN TESTEN PLATTENFÖRMIGER OPTISCHER ELEMENTE | [2023/17] | English: | APPARATUS FOR OPTICAL TESTING OF PLATE-SHAPED OPTICAL ELEMENTS | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TEST OPTIQUE D'ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES EN FORME DE PLAQUES | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/07] | CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON OPTISCHEN PROBEN | ||
Former [2021/07] | OPTICAL SAMPLE CHARACTERIZATION | ||
Former [2021/07] | CARACTÉRISATION D'ÉCHANTILLON OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7612879 (STUMPE JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-10,12,14,16 * column 1, lines 9-11 * * column 3, line 66 * * column 4, lines 28-32 * * column 4, lines 38-42 * * column 5, lines 4-42 * * figure 2 * [I] 2-4,11,13; | [I]US2015233824 (RICHARDS EVAN M [US], et al) [I] 1-16* paragraphs [0019] , [0 28] - [0041]; figures 4, 6A, 6B * | International search | [X]US3969023 (BRANDT NEILL M, et al) [X] 1* The whole document *; | [X]JP2001021448 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-24 * The whole document *; | [X]US2008192239 (OTOSAKA TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1 * The whole document * | by applicant | US7612879 | US2015233824 |