EP3780893 - UE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories, Hong Kong SAR / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories, HK / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAKURA, Tsuyoshi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
ARAMOTO, Masafumi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19786170.1 | 09.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP15487 | Priority number, date | JP20180074587 | 09.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018074587 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019198717 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780893 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/50, H04W4/90, H04W36/14, H04W48/18, H04W80/10, H04L29/06, H04M3/00, H04M7/00, H04M11/04, // H04W88/06 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04M7/0057 (EP);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP);
H04L65/1033 (EP);
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L65/1073 (EP);
H04M11/04 (EP);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04M2207/187 (EP);
H04M2242/04 (EP);
H04W36/1443 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W76/50, H04M3/00, H04M11/04, H04W36/14, H04W48/18, H04W80/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/07] | English: | UE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD THEREOF | [2021/07] | French: | UE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | Translation filed | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009191841 (EDGE STEPHEN W [US], et al); | [X]US2014045448 (MALLICK PRATEEK BASU [IN], et al); | [X]EP2723126 (ST ERICSSON SA [CH]); | [X]WO2016091328 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) | International search | [Y]JP2010528494 ; | [Y]US2010240338 (MALLICK PRATEEK BASU [IN], et al); | [Y]JP2013258486 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [Y]JP2016103778 (FUJITSU LTD); | by applicant | JP2018074587 |