EP3780375 - DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Takashi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KAGEYAMA, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
SAKURAI, Naoki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19786181.8 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP15693 | Priority number, date | JP20180075513 | 10.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018075513 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019198775 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780375 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, // H02M7/219, H02M7/5387, H02M7/797 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H02M1/327 (EP);
H02M7/219 (EP);
H02M7/5387 (EP);
H02M7/797 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG UND DIAGNOSESYSTEM | [2021/07] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC ET SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2020 | Translation filed | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2016220481 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragrahs 14, 31; FIGURES 7, 8 *; | [I]JP2017123704 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 59] , [0 60]; figure 4 *; | [T]JP2020162241 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST CO LTD) [T] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0851768 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012076454 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings & CN 102398354 A *; | [A]JP2016220481 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017123704 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017123742 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2018061287 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH07170721 | JP2013142704 |