EP3773577 - TRICYCLIC ASK1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terns, Inc. 1065 E. Hillsdale Blvd. Suite 100 Foster City, California 94404 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yingzi 1065 E. Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 100 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
HALCOMB, Randall 1065 E. Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 100 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 03 /
KIRSCHBERG, Thorsten A. 1065 E. Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 100 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 04 /
ROMERO, F. Anthony 1065 E. Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 100 Foster City, California 94404 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19786244.4 | 12.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US27236 | Priority number, date | US201862656764P | 12.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862656764 P | US201862720863P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720863 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019200267 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773577 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, C07D498/10, C07D519/00, A61K31/444, A61K31/506, A61P1/16, A61P9/04, A61P9/12, A61P13/12, A61P25/28, A61P29/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | C07D498/04, C07D498/10, C07D519/00, A61K31/444, A61K31/506 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61K31/444, A61K31/506, C07D401/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE ASK1-INHIBITOREN | [2021/07] | English: | TRICYCLIC ASK1 INHIBITORS | [2021/07] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'ASK1 TRICYCLIQUES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11349572 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO) | International search | [A]US2012004267 (CORKEY BRITTON [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 16-17 * ; paragraphs [0009], [0014], [0016]-[0017] *; | [A]US2014228411 (NOTTE GREGORY [US]) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 16-17 * ; paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2016304523 (ALEXANDER RIKKI PETER [GB], et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 16-17* ; paragraph [0011] *; | [A]US2017196844 (GRAUPE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 16-17 * ; paragraphs [0009]-[0011], [0016]. [0018] * | by applicant | US2012004267 | US2014228411 | US2016304523 | US2017196844 | - ICHIJO et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 275, pages 90 - 94 | - HATTORI et al., Cell Comm. Signal., (20090000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 10 | - TAKEDA et al., Annu. Rev. Pharmacol. Toxicol., (20070000), vol. 48, no. 1-8, page 27 | - NAGAI et al., J. Biochem. Mol., (20070000), vol. 40, pages 1 - 6 | - WATANABE et al., BBRC, (20050000), vol. 333, pages 562 - 567 | - ZHANG et al., Cell Death Dis., (20140000), vol. 5, no. 10, page 467 | - TERADA et al., BBRC, (20070000), vol. 364, pages 1043 - 49 | - SINGH et al., Nat. Rev. Endocrinol., (20110000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 176 - 184 | - BROWNLEE M., Nature, (20010000), vol. 414, no. 6865, pages 813 - 820 | - MIMURA et al., Nat. Rev., (20100000), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 667 - 678 | - HUNG et al., Am. J. Nephrol., (20090000), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 192 - 202 | - NOGRADY, Medicinal Chemistry A Biochemical Approach, Oxford University Press, (19850000), pages 388 - 392 |