EP4042718 - FITTING TWO HEARING DEVICES SIMULTANEOUSLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEILNER, Manuela Bachtelweg 26B 8132 Egg b. Zürich / CH | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Sykora & König Patentanwälte PartG mbB Maximilianstraße 2 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB Goethestraße 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19786538.9 | 08.10.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019EP77224 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069063 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042718 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R2225/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | GLEICHZEITIGES ANPASSEN VON ZWEI HÖRGERÄTEN | [2022/33] | English: | FITTING TWO HEARING DEVICES SIMULTANEOUSLY | [2022/33] | French: | RACCORDEMENT SIMULTANÉ DE DEUX DISPOSITIFS AUDITIFS | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2008080394 (PLATZ RAINER [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2013308802 (EATON ANTHONY M [GB], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract; figures 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0 46] - [0048] - [0 53] , [0 60] *; | [Y]KR20150131664 (BIOSOUNDLAB CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3* paragraphs [0013] , [0038] * | by applicant | WO2011147998 |