EP3870866 - ROTARY ATTACHMENT ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOODWIN INTERNATIONAL 74 rue Roc Saint Nicaise 7500 Tournai / BE | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROOT, Bernard 34, rue Françoise De Beauffremez 59700 MARCQ EN BAROEUL / FR | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Matkowska, Franck Matkowska & Associés 9, rue Jacques Prévert 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19786613.0 | 17.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78285 | Priority number, date | FR20180059733 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1859733 | [2021/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083751 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870866 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/02, F16B23/00, F16B7/18, F16B37/04, F16B21/06 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
F16B21/02 (EP);
F16B21/065 (EP);
F16B23/00 (EP);
F16B37/042 (EP);
F16B7/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | DREHBARES BEFESTIGUNGSZUBEHÖR | [2021/35] | English: | ROTARY ATTACHMENT ACCESSORY | [2021/35] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE FIXATION ROTATIF | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 12.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Request for further processing for: | 12.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2004086918 (ABBOTT HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,15,16,18-20,25,27,28,30,33,40,43-45,47,49-52,54 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-5 * * page 6, line 23 - page 8, line 4 * * page 11, lines 1-11; figures 1-13 * [A] 5,34,48 [I] 9,17,22-24,26,29,31,35-39,41,42,53,55; | [XI]JPS6277310U (NN) [X] 1-4,19,21,22,32 * figures 1-4 * [I] 23,24; | [XI]US2006207404 (IZUTANI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,15,18-20,33,45 * figures 18-21 * [I] 4,9,24; | [X]DE3330297 (DETHLEFFS CARAVANS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,10-15,22,33,35,45,46,49,53-55 * page 8, paragraph last - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *; | [A]AU437432B (JOSE ROSAN) [A] 17,18 * figures 13-17 *; | [A]EP1255012 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0024] , [0031] *; | [A]GB646210 (UNITED CARR FASTENER CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1780364 (SCHITTER GABRIELLE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2014057216 |