EP3863570 - ENVELOPING BODY AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A CONTOUR OF AN AMPUTATION STUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ottobock SE & Co. KGaA Max-Näder-Strasse 15 37115 Duderstadt / DE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT-LAATSCH, Erik 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 02 /
NOLTE, Michael 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 03 /
DRIESEBERG, Jens 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 04 /
WILL, Christian 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 05 /
BETZ, Sebastian 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 06 /
ENGELBART, Hendryk 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 07 /
FINKE, Lars Benjamin 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 08 /
BIELEFELD, Thilo 37115 Duderstadt / DE | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
ALBRECHT-LAATSCH, Erik Am hohlen Wege 35 37124 Rosdorf / DE | ||
02 /
NOLTE, Michael Eichsfeldstrasse 70 37136 Seeburg / DE | |||
03 /
DRIESEBERG, Jens Adolph-Roemer-Strasse 20 38678 Clausthal-Zellerfeld / DE | |||
04 /
WILL, Christian Kaakweg 12 37077 Göttingen / DE | |||
05 /
BETZ, Sebastian Am Kirschberge 86 37085 Göttingen / DE | |||
06 /
ENGELBART, Hendryk Stegemühlenweg 18 37083 Göttingen / DE | |||
07 /
FINKE, Lars Benjamin Falkenhagen 35 37136 Landolfshausen / DE | |||
08 /
BIELEFELD, Thilo Dorfstrasse 19 29416 Kuhfelde OT Siedenlangenbeck / DE | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/33] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 19786737.7 | 04.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP76862 | Priority number, date | DE201810125144 | 11.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018125144 | [2021/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074374 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863570 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3863570 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/50, A61F2/76, A61F2/78, G01B11/16, G01B15/06, G01B17/04 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/76 (EP);
A61F2/5046 (EP,US);
A61B5/1073 (US);
A61F2/7812 (EP,US);
G01B11/165 (EP,US);
G01B15/04 (US);
G01B15/06 (EP);
G01B17/04 (EP);
A61B34/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜLLKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN EINER KONTUR EINES AMPUTATIONSSTUMPFES | [2021/33] | English: | ENVELOPING BODY AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A CONTOUR OF AN AMPUTATION STUMP | [2021/33] | French: | VOLUME ENGLOBANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN CONTOUR D'UN MOIGNON D'AMPUTATION | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 05.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24159493.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014130878 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US]); | [A]WO2016033469 (BIONIC SKINS LLC [US]); | [XAI]WO2017011753 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | by applicant | DE202016001130U |