EP3871126 - CONTAINER BUILDER FOR INDIVIDUALIZED NETWORK SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETSCH, Thomas High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
AMTHOR, Thomas, Erik High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BORGERT, Jörn High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HELLE, Michael, Günter High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19787004.1 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78694 | Priority number, date | EP20180201688 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18201688 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083891 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871126 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F9/455 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
G06F21/6281 (EP,US);
G06F21/53 (US);
G06F9/455 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (US);
H04L67/02 (US);
G06F2009/45587 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | CONTAINERBUILDER FÜR INDIVIDUALISIERTE NETZWERKDIENSTE | [2021/35] | English: | CONTAINER BUILDER FOR INDIVIDUALIZED NETWORK SERVICES | [2021/35] | French: | CONSTRUCTEUR DE CONTENEUR POUR SERVICES DE RÉSEAU INDIVIDUALISÉS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2011314466 (BERG DANIEL C [US], et al) [I] 11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * [A] 1-10,12; | [IA]EP3267351 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [I] 11,13-15 * abstract * [A] 1-10,12; | [IA] - Dirk Merkel, "Docker: Lightweight Linux Containers for Consistent Development and Deployment", Linux Journal, Volume 2014 Issue 239, March 2014, (20140301), URL: www.linuxjournal.com, (20150220), XP055171140 [I] 11,13-15 * page 87 - page 90 * [A] 1-10,12 | by applicant | US2011314466 | US2017098092 | EP3267351 |