EP3867123 - ADJUSTING DRIVE FOR A STEERING COLUMN AND STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Sebastian Dums 7 6811 Göfis / AT | 02 /
SPECHT, Jean-Pierre Giessenstrasse 15 9469 Haag / CH | 03 /
SCHACHT, Arne An der Nafla 10 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19787240.1 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77732 | Priority number, date | DE201810217960 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018217960 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078877 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867123 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/181, F16H25/14, F16H25/20, F16H25/24 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B62D1/181 (EP,US);
F16H25/2003 (EP);
F16H25/2015 (EP);
F16H25/24 (EP);
F16H2025/209 (EP);
F16H2025/249 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | VERSTELLANTRIEB FÜR EINE LENKSÄULE UND LENKSÄULE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/34] | English: | ADJUSTING DRIVE FOR A STEERING COLUMN AND STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/34] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT DE RÉGLAGE DESTINÉ À UNE COLONNE DE DIRECTION ET COLONNE DE DIRECTION DESTINÉE À UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1891224U (KOELLNER FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * figure 1 * * page 1 - page 3 *; | [XAI]JP2009248703 (NSK LTD) [X] 1-6,10,14,15 * figures 1, 5, 8, 11 * [A] 7 [I] 11-13; | [A]DE102015224602 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [A] 11,12 * figures 6, 7 *; | [YDA]DE102017207561 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-6,8-15 * figures 1-5 * [A] 7; | [A]DE202018104386U (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | DE102017207561 |