EP3861572 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOONE, Mark R. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 02 /
HENSCHEL, Mark E. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19787539.6 | 30.09.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US53765 | Priority number, date | US201816148702 | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US201816148702 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072345 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861572 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3861572 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/62, H01S5/022, H01S5/042, H01S5/42, A61N1/00 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L31/167 (US);
A61N1/36125 (EP);
H01L25/165 (US);
H01L25/167 (US);
H01L31/12 (US);
H01L33/0093 (US);
H01L33/0095 (US);
H01L33/52 (US);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01S5/0201 (US);
H01S5/02208 (EP,US);
H01S5/02234 (US);
H01S5/02325 (US);
H01S5/02345 (EP);
H01S5/0237 (US);
H01S5/0425 (US);
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0238 (US);
A61B2562/182 (US);
A61B5/0084 (US);
H01L2933/0033 (US);
H01L2933/005 (US);
H01L2933/0066 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES SCHALTUNGSGEHÄUSE | [2021/32] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT PACKAGE | [2021/32] | French: | BOÎTIER DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008035935 (SHUM FRANK T [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0038] - [0067] *; | [A]WO2009143462 (VI SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * pages 11-20 *; | [A]US8241932 (YU CHIH-KUANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 61 - column 8 *; | [A]US2015076529 (WANG PING [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7* paragraphs [0025] - [0045] *; | [A]US2015129906 (WEIGERT MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0048] *; | [X]EP3255686 (LITE-ON OPTO TECH (CHANGZHOU) CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0056] - [0060] *; | [A]WO2018053378 (MONTROSE LABORATORIES LLC [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * page 5, line 14 - page 12 * | Examination | US2015262983 |