EP3782645 - ANTICANCER T CELL THERAPY PRODUCT-ASSISTING COMPOSITION COMPRISING DEPLETING ANTI-CD4 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Cancer Center Madu-dong 323 Ilsan-ro Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10408 / KR | For all designated states Eutilex Co., Ltd. Suite 1401 Daeryung Technotown 17 Cha 25 Gasan Digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08594 / KR | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Beom Kyu Haesol Maeul 2-danji World Merdian, Mokdong-dong) 208-1502, 347, Waseoksunhwan-ro Paju-si, Gyeonggi-do 10893 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seon Hee Jeongbalsan-dong) 3rd Floor, 63-29, Ilsan-ro 380beon-gil, Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10406 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Byoung Se Hipark City Ilsan Familie 4-danji, Deogi-dong) 402-2503, 61, Hi park 3-ro, Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10235 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Young Ho Tanhyeon Maeul 12-danji Apt., Tanhyeon-dong) 1203-1805, 12, Sanhyeon-ro 17beon-gil, Ilsanseo- gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10344 / KR | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19788111.3 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019KR04349 | Priority number, date | KR20180044411 | 17.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180044411 | [2021/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019203497 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782645 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61K31/664, A61K31/675, A61K31/7076, A61K35/17, A61K38/20, A61N5/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/02 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K31/664 (KR);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464492 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K16/2812 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
A61K2039/585 (EP);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/08] | A61K39/395, A61K31/664, A61K31/7076, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ANTI-KREBS-T-ZELL-THERAPIEPRODUKT MIT ABREICHERNDEM MONOKLONALEN ANTI-CD4-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/08] | English: | ANTICANCER T CELL THERAPY PRODUCT-ASSISTING COMPOSITION COMPRISING DEPLETING ANTI-CD4 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF | [2021/08] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ASSISTANCE DE PRODUIT DE THÉRAPIE ANTICANCÉREUSE PAR LYMPHOCYTES T COMPRENANT UN ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL ANTI-CD4 INDUISANT LA DÉPLÉTION DES LYMPHOCYTES CD4+ ET SON UTILISATION | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2020 | Translation filed | 04.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008003473 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,13-15 * example 9 *; | [XY] - WEIQING JING ET AL, "Depletion of CD4 T cells enhances immunotherapy for neuroblastoma after syngeneic HSCT but compromises development of antitumor immune memory", BLOOD, US, (20090430), vol. 113, no. 18, doi:10.1182/blood-2008-11-190827, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4449 - 4457, XP055493212 [X] 8-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-11-190827 | [A] - MOTOYOSHI YASUHIDE ET AL, "Different mechanisms for anti-tumor effects of low- and high-dose cyclophosphamide.", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (2006), vol. 16, pages 141 - 146, XP055869250 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [T] - KIM SEON-HEE ET AL, "Adoptive immunotherapy with transient anti-CD4 treatment enhances anti-tumor response by increasing IL-18R[alpha]hi CD8+ T cells", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41467-021-25559-7, (20210907), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s41467-021-25559-7, XP055869243 [T] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41467-021-25559-7 | International search | [A]JP3168005B (UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON)[A] 12-20; | [A]KR20070098475 (UNIV ULSAN FOUND FOR IND COOP [KR]) [A] 12-20; | [A]KR20080112300 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 12-20; | [XY] - JING, W, "Depletion of CD 4 T cells enhances immunotherapy for neuroblastoma after syngeneic HSCT but compromises development of antitumor immune memory", Blood, (20090000), vol. 113, no. 18, doi:10.1182/blood-2008-11-190827, pages 4449 - 4457, XP055493212 [X] 12-17 * 4449, 4450, 4453; 4 * [Y] 18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-11-190827 | [Y] - JACKAMAN, C., "IL -2 Intratumoral Immunotherapy Enhances CD 8+ T Cells That Mediate Destruction of Tumor Cells and Tumor-Associated Vasculature: A Novel Mechanism for IL -2", The Journal of Immunology, (20030000), vol. 171, no. 10, pages 5051 - 5063, XP055644966 [Y] 18-20 * 4449 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.171.10.5051 | [A] - MAHNKE, K., "Opening a Niche for Therapy: Local Lymphodepletion Helps the Immune System to Fight Melanoma", Journal of Investigative Dermatology, (20140000), vol. 134, no. 7, pages 1794 - 1796, XP055644968 [A] 12-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/jid.2014.100 | [A] - SCHNIZLEIN-BICK, C., "Effects of CD 4 and CD 8 T lymphocyte depletion on the course of histoplasmosis following pulmonary challenge", Medical Mycology, (20030000), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1080/1369378031000137279, pages 189 - 197, XP055644984 [A] 12-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/1369378031000137279 | by applicant | KR101503341B | KR20180044411 |