EP3781641 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A BONDING RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASLI BAKIR, Ben Fältspatsvägen 24B 132 35 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 02 /
ZAFAR, Ashar Oxelvägen 43 138 32 Älta / SE | 03 /
EKSTRÖM, Jesper Resare Bengts Plan 3 121 45 Johanneshov / SE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19788281.4 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019IB53099 | Priority number, date | SE20180050469 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: SE 1850469 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202477 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781641 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J197/00, C08H8/00, C08L97/00, C09J161/00, B27N3/00, C08H7/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C08G16/0293 (EP);
C09J197/00 (SE);
B27N1/0209 (EP);
B27N3/002 (EP);
B27N3/007 (EP);
C08H6/00 (EP);
C08H8/00 (SE);
C08L97/00 (SE);
C08L97/005 (EP);
C09J161/00 (SE);
C09J161/06 (EP);
B27N3/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09J161/06, C08L97/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | C09J197/00, C08H8/00, C08L97/00, C09J161/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BINDEHARZES | [2021/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A BONDING RESIN | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE RÉSINE DE COLLAGE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 22.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2042476 (FORINTEK CANADA CORP [CA]) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 * | International search | [X]WO9424192 (ALCELL TECH INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-8 * ; abstract; page 38, line 25 - page 39, line 2; Example 17 and 20 *; | [X]US2013292864 (BREYER ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 8 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0084]-[0091]; claims 1-11; Table 1 and 2 *; | [X]US2016369033 (DELMAS MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 5 * ; abstract; Table 5 *; | [X]WO9218557 (REPAP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * ; whole document; abstract *; | [X]WO9321260 (ALCELL TECH INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-8 * ; whole document; abstract *; | [A]US2016376434 (VALKONEN SANNA [FI], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; abstract *; | [A]WO2015114211 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]) [A] 1-8 * ; abstract * |