EP3782079 - MODEL INTERPRETATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H2O.AI Inc. 2307 Leghorn Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Mark 2307 Leghorn Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
GILL, Navdeep 2307 Leghorn Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
HALL, Patrick 2307 Leghorn Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | McKinnon, Alistair James WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19788527.0 | 08.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US26331 | Priority number, date | US201815959040 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: US201815959040 | US201815959030 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: US201815959030 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019204072 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782079 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N5/04, G06N5/00, G06N20/20, G06N7/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G06N5/045 (EP);
G06N20/20 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | G06N3/02, G06N3/063, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | MODELLINTERPRETATION | [2021/08] | English: | MODEL INTERPRETATION | [2021/08] | French: | INTERPRÉTATION DE MODÈLE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 07.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003212520 (CAMPOS MARCOS M [US], et al); | [A]US2015379429 (LEE POLLY PO YEE [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2003212520 (CAMPOS MARCOS M [US], et al) [Y] 14, 15 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0068] *; | [A]US2014222349 (HIGGINS GERALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document *; | [A]US2018018590 (SZETO CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [XY] - HALL. Patrick et al., "MACHINE LEARNING INTERPRETABILITY WITH H20 DRIVERLESS Al", Publication, (20191000), pages 1 - 40, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20180218055624/http://docs.h2o.ai/driveness-ai/latest-stable/docs/bonklets/MLIBooklet.pdf, (20190722), XP055643632 [X] 1-13, 16-20 * . * [Y] 14, 15 | by applicant | - PATRICK HALL et al., Machine Learning Interpretability with H20 Driverless AI |