EP3781318 - EMULSIFIERS AND THE USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phytoption, LLC 3495 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states PHYTOPTION, LLC 3495 Kent Avenue West Lafayette IN 47906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingmin 3495 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk Zwicker Schnappauf & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Corbyn, David Jonathan Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19788562.7 | 19.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US28411 | Priority number, date | US201862659950P | 19.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862659950 P | US201862698193P | 15.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862698193 P | US201862731960P | 16.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731960 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019204793 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781318 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B02C11/00, B02C11/08, B02C9/00, B02C9/02, B02C9/04, A23L7/10, A23L29/10, A61K8/04, A61K8/06, A23L35/00, A61K8/11, A23L27/00, A23L29/212, A21D2/26, A21D2/36, A21D13/068, A61K8/9789, A61K8/9794, A61Q19/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A23L35/10 (EP);
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
A21D13/068 (EP);
A21D2/265 (EP,US);
A21D2/36 (EP,US);
A23L27/72 (EP);
A23L29/212 (EP);
A23L33/105 (US);
A23L7/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61K8/9794 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
B02C11/00 (EP);
B02C11/08 (EP);
B02C9/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
A61K2800/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/548 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | B02C11/00, B02C11/08, B02C9/00, B02C9/02, B02C9/04, A23L7/10, A23L29/10, A61K8/04, A61K8/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | EMULGATOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/08] | English: | EMULSIFIERS AND THE USES THEREOF | [2021/08] | French: | ÉMULSIFIANTS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017099132 (NISSHIN FOODS INC [JP]); | [X]US2017245508 (YANG GUOSHEN [US], et al); | International search | [XYA]US2006286279 (EASTMAN JENNIFER [US], et al); | [YA]US2009155439 (GINGRAS LEO [US], et al); | [YA]US2010252031 (STANLEY KEITH D [US], et al); | [YA]WO2016145561 (EVONIK SPECIALTY CHEMICALS (SHANGHAI) CO LTD [CN], et al); | [Y]US2017006879 (BAIER STEFAN K [US], et al) |