EP3783353 - CONSTANT POTENTIAL ELECTROLYSIS GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riken Keiki Co., Ltd. 7-6 Azusawa 2-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8744 / JP | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESUGI, Shinji c/o Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-3 Minamisakae-cho Kasukabe-shi, Saitama 344-0057 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Kei c/o Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-3 Minamisakae-cho Kasukabe-shi, Saitama 344-0057 / JP | 03 /
MIYAGAWA, Naoyuki c/o Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-3 Minamisakae-cho Kasukabe-shi, Saitama 344-0057 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19789437.1 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019JP03083 | Priority number, date | JP20180081117 | 20.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018081117 | [2021/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019202807 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783353 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/404, G01N27/416 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G01N27/416 (EP,KR);
G01N27/404 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/0036 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYSEGASSENSOR MIT KONSTANTEM POTENZIAL | [2021/08] | English: | CONSTANT POTENTIAL ELECTROLYSIS GAS SENSOR | [2021/08] | French: | CAPTEUR DE GAZ D'ÉLECTROLYSE À POTENTIEL CONSTANT | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | Translation filed | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6267443 (MORIKI YUICHI) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * [I] 2,3,7; | [XI]US5611908 (MATTHIESSEN HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-5 * * column 1, line 36 - column 4, line 14 * [I] 2,4,6,7; | [XI]US6236873 (HOLMSTROEM NILS [SE]) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 14 - column 9, line 26 * [I] 4,7; | [XI]US6321101 (HOLMSTROEM NILS [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1-12 * * column 4, line 10 - column 12, line 55 * [I] 4,7; | [A]JP2012032186 (CHINO CORP) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0024] * | International search | [A]JPS5937455 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-7* , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH05203613 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-7 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [XYA]US5611908 (MATTHIESSEN HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1, 5 * , claims, column 2, line 50 to column 3, line 15, column 4, lines 7-9, fig. 1, 2a, 2b, 3a, 3b & GB 9526147 A & DE 4445948 A1 & FR 2728685 A1 * [Y] 6-7 [A] 2-4; | [Y]JP2011174722 (RIKEN KEIKI KK) [Y] 6 * , paragraph [0014], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012032186 (CHINO CORP) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0024], [0025], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016008906 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-7 * , claims & US 2015/0377826 A1, claims & CN 105203603 A & KR 10-2016-0000864 A *; | [Y]JP2016164510 (NEW COSMOS ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 6 * , claim 6, paragraphs [0024], [0029], fig. 1 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2010185855 |