EP3754757 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/52] | ANODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2023/32] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAE, Oh Byong LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
WOO, Sang Wook LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Je Young LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19789485.0 | 18.03.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019KR03146 | Priority number, date | KR20180044541 | 17.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180044541 | [2020/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019203455 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754757 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754757 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0525 (KR,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP);
H01M4/0402 (US);
H01M4/0459 (KR);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR);
H01M4/364 (KR,US);
H01M4/386 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01M4/139, H01M4/04, H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2023/32] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME | [2023/32] | French: | ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA COMPRENANT | [2023/32] |
Former [2020/52] | ANODE FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | ||
Former [2020/52] | ANODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | ||
Former [2020/52] | ANODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2020 | Translation filed | 15.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008305746 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]KR20120093487 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]US2014295267 (WANG NA [CN]); | [A]KR20170058798 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]US2017294648 (BURSHTAIN DORON [IL], et al) | by applicant | KR20140070261 |