EP3874673 - SMALL DATA COMMUNICATION SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIFVESSON, Monica Kruthornsgränden 3 226 52 LUND / SE | 02 /
BEN HENDA, Noamen Tumultgränd 228 162 47 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19789653.3 | 15.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019EP77869 | Priority number, date | US201862755045P | 02.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862755045 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020088928 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874673 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L29/06, H04W12/04 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H04L9/0819 (EP);
H04W12/0431 (US);
H04L9/0861 (EP);
H04L9/0891 (EP);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSICHERHEIT KLEINER DATEN | [2021/36] | English: | SMALL DATA COMMUNICATION SECURITY | [2021/36] | French: | SÉCURITÉ D'UNE COMMUNICATION DE PETITES DONNÉES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 20.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |